This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:30:18 (UTC).

KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES VS AYALA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AYALA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3036

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Defendants

AYALA, DAISY

OSEGUEDA, JESUS

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Partial Satisfaction - Comment: AS TO DAISY AYALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES; Awarded Against: AYALA, DAISY; Amount; Damages: $1,402.00; Costs: $60.00; Total: $1462.00; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 01/03/2018; Status Comment: COURT COSTS TO BE PAID DIRECTLY TO THE COURT AND CANCELLATION OF PAYMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketOriginal Promissory Note Cancelled - Comment: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES BY ROSE RECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: AS TO DAISY AYALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO JESUS OSEGUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES; Unserved; Served: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO JESUS OSEGUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO DAISY AYALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO JESUS OSEGUEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO DAISY AYALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO KCDHS BY JULIE ANDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA INTEROFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less