This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:52:45 (UTC).

KERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT/BAKERSFIELD COLLEGE VS RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 KERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT/BAKERSFIELD COLLEGE filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1705

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT/BAKERSFIELD COLLEGE

Respondent

RAMIREZ, VINCENT Y

Not Classified By Court

MARTINEZ, BERNADETTE I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, ALAN B

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Minute Order- Petition for Harassment 1/6/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE; Parties Present Petitioner: KERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT/BAKERSFIELD COLLEGE; Attorney: HARRIS, ALAN B; Respondent: RAMIREZ, VINCENT Y; Employee: MARTINEZ, BERNADETTE I

Ruling

Minute Order- Ruling on Petition for Harassment heard on 1/6/16: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 100 YARD STAY AWAY GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REPONSE TO PETITION FOR RESTRAINING ORDER. NOT SIGNED BY RESPONDENT, NOT FILED BEFORE HEARING DATE. REJECT PER COMMISSIONER ETIENNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO VINCENT Y. RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Minute Order- Petition for Harassment 1/6/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order- Ruling on Petition for Harassment heard on 1/6/16: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: AS TO VINCENT Y. RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 1-6-16, 8:30 AM, D-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED. 100 YARD STAY AWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT/BAKERSFIELD COLLEGE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketPetition Workplace Violence

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.