This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 19:48:42 (UTC).

KERN CENTRAL CREDIT UNION VS ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 11/03/2003 KERN CENTRAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4264

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERN CENTRAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

ORTIZ, MARTIN

ORTIZ, IRMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROBER, DEAN R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2006
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: COUNTY: KERN DATE OF RECORDING: 3/22/06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • Docket117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for KERN CENTRAL CREDIT UNION (PL-1). Received from POLK, PROBER & RAPHAEL, check no(s) 117989. Receipt #83208 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: KERN CENTRAL CREDIT UNION JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARTIN ORTIZ AND IRMA ORTIZ DAMAGES $ 8511.88 INTEREST $ 180.25 ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 COSTS $ 300.30 TOTAL $ 9492.43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1-25 ONLY. DULY ENTERED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF JOHN B. ROGERS RE ACCRUED INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF ROGER FLORES IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO CCP 585 (A) ET SEQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketDefault Entered as Requested On - Comment: DATE: 01/12/04 PARTY: MARTIN ORTIZ AND IRMA ORTIZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2003
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT WAS SERVED: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SERVED ON : MARTIN ORTIZ, PERSON SERVED IRMA ORTIZ/CO-OCCUPANT AT 9801 SAN DIEGO ST., LAMONT, CA ON 11/12/03 AT 8:25AM BY PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT WAS SERVED: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PARTY SERVED: IRMA ORTIZ WAS SERVED BY A PROCESS SERVER AT 9801 SAN DIEGO ST.,LAMONT, CA. ON 11/12/03 AT 8:25AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2003
  • DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • Docket843A Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 (1/1/01) - Comment: Amount of $135.30 for KERN CENTRAL CREDIT UNION (PL-1). Received from POLK, SCHEER & PROBER, check no(s) 115342. Receipt #59942 for amount of $135.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2003
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2003
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2003
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROBER DEAN R. ESQ.