This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 15:25:43 (UTC).

KERLIN VS KERLIN

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 KERLIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KERLIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0277

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KERLIN, AMIE MARIE

Respondent

KERLIN, MATTHEW ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling 11/29/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 11/22/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: KERLIN, AMIE MARIE; Respondent: KERLIN, MATTHEW ALLEN

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: KERLIN, AMIE MARIE; Respondent: KERLIN, MATTHEW ALLEN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: KERLIN, AMIE MARIE; KERLIN, MATTHEW ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: STATUS DATE 3/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170) - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Comment: Re: SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT Hearing Date: 10/4/17 Hearing Time: 9:00 Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less