Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 23:18:16 (UTC).

KEOUGH VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 KEOUGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5500

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEOUGH, NANCY W.

JENKINS, JOHN

KEOUGH, JAMES

Defendants

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEOUGH, NANCY W.

Defendant Attorney

KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K

 

Court Documents

Demurrer

Demurrer 03/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/26/2021 Defendant, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC; CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALITY LLC Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Ruling

Ruling 03/29/2021: Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer

Demurrer 03/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/26/2021 Defendant, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC; CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALITY LLC Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 02/09/2021: Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/06/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 12

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Nancy Keough Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform with complaint.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: reassigned to Judge Stephen D Schuett for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketTo ensure the public has access to court proceedings - Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 03/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/26/2021 Defendant, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC; CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALITY LLC Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/29/2021: Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 03/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/26/2021 Defendant, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC; CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALITY LLC Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketReply - Comment: to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: re Opposition to Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Daniel Klingenberger in Support of Certificate of Inability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Central Valley Hospitality via Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Marriott International, Inc., via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/31/20201:45 PM; Served: 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/06/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Nancy Keough Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform with complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLINGENBERGER, DANIEL K