This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:55:37 (UTC).

KEMPER SERVICES GROUP VS OCHOA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 KEMPER SERVICES GROUP filed an Other lawsuit against OCHOA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5854

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEMPER SERVICES GROUP

Defendants

MUNOZ, GEORGE

ESPITIA, YVONNE

WALDROP, MICHAEL

OCHOA, LUIS

OCHOA, PATRICIA

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

FUENTES, GUADALUPE

CENTRAL SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY RISK MANAGEMENT AUTHORITY CITY OF DELANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEEL, JAMES W

Defendant Attorneys

DULCICH, JOHN S

GASPARIAN, MARTIN V.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Letter from John S Dulcich

Court Trial

FCMC/Court Trial 04/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 03/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/3/18 Plaintiff, KERMPER SERVICES GROUP Motion for Order Discharging Plaintiff from Liability; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PEEL, JAMES W

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER. FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE PAID FOR EACH ANSWERING PARTY.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 22,2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Letter from John S Dulcich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refunds as follows: $25,009.26 to George Munoz and John Dulcich, $4,620.74 to Kemper Services Group, and $370 to Kern County Superior Court (Civil Division). Completed on 06/06/19. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Regarding Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - FCMC/Court Trial 04/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - FCMC/Court Trial 04/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Yvonne Espitia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO GEORGE MUNOZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO GEORGE MUNOZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketAnswer-Complaint in Intervention - Comment: AS TO GEORGE MUNOZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons via File & Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 10/17/2017; Served: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 22,2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Non Fast Track

    Read MoreRead Less