This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:04 (UTC).

KELLY VS BROWN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 KELLY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0177

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY, JAMIE

Defendant

BROWN, SHEILA F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CHECK

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: APPLICATION AND WRIT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE & WRIT

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Defendant: BROWN, SHEILA F

Ruling

Ruling 04/04/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO F.E.S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: APPLICATION AND WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE & WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: KELLY, JAMIE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 7525 WALPOLE AVE APT 3, CALIFORNIA CITY CA 93505, KERN COUNTY; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: BROWN, SHEILA F; Party: Names: KELLY, JAMIE; BROWN, SHEILA F; GEORGE, CHRISTEN; MENIFIELD, CECILIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Entry of Judgment and Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/04/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KELLY, JAMIE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.