Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 20:04:37 (UTC).

KELLIE C GRIMM TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 KELLIE C GRIMM TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3044

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GREEN, JEFFREY A

ANDERSON, KARI L

GRIMM, KARI L

GRIMM, KELLIE C

MERRIMAN, KELLIE C

Not Classified By Court

GRIMM, KARI

GRIMM, ROBERT A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KRASILOVSKY, SETH W.

DeCOSTA, KARL J.

WILSON, JOSHUA G

LETZEL, ALEXANDRA A.

NELSON, DAVID C.

GARB, ANDREW S.

VIDAL, GABRIELLE A.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILED

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 09/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Supplement to Petition to Modify Trust; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: LETZEL, ALEXANDRA A.; Petitioner; Attorney: LETZEL, ALEXANDRA A.

Further Case Management Conference

Petition 07/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC re: petition to review reasonableness to trustee's compensation (continued from 06/01/2018) 07/13/2018 CALENDAR #1

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: petition to review reasonableness to trustee's compensation 06/01/18 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VIDAL, GABRIELLE A.; Petitioner; Attorney: VIDAL, GABRIELLE A.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC re: petition to review reasonableness to trustee's compensation 04/27/2018 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WILSON, JOSHUA G; Petitioner; Attorney: LETZEL, ALEXANDRA A.; Petitioner; Attorney: LETZEL, ALEXANDRA A.

Petition

(2) Petitions 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition to review reasonableness to trustee's compensation [Probate code 17200(b)(9)] [Request for judicial notice submitted simultaneously herewith] Notes: Need proof of service on minor Jack Merriman 01/11/2018 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KRASILOVSKY, SETH W.; Attorney: WILSON, JOSHUA G; Petitioner; Attorney: VIDAL, GABRIELLE A.; Petitioner; Attorney: VIDAL, GABRIELLE A.

Ruling

12/28/17 MO Ruling-Continuance: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF HEARINGPROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPORT OF PETITION TO REVIEW REASONABLENESS OF TRUSTEE'S COMPENSATION...First Legal Support Services

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing returned to attorney via ACS outbasket

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order Granting Petition to Modify Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 09/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Supplement to Petition to Modify Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition to modify trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal f Petition to Review Reasonableness of Trustee's Compensation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice-Petitino to Review filed on 10/30/17 by Jeffrey A. Green

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of entry of order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: granting petition for order approving settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 01/04/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Notice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Petition to Review Reasonableness of Trustee's Compensation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 01/04/2018 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, NOTICE OF HEARINGPROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPORT OF PETITION TO REVIEW REASONABLENESS OF TRUSTEE'S COMPENSATION...First Legal Support Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing returned to attorney via ACS outbasket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent) - Comment: Petition to modify trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: Request for judicial notice in support of petition to review reasonableness to trustee's compensation [Probate code 452(d) and 453]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: Notice of related cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to review reasonableness to trustee's compensation [Probate code 17200(b)(9)] [Request for judicial notice submitted simultaneously herewith]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LETZEL ALEXANDRA ALLEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECOSTA KARL J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Nelson