This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:37:38 (UTC).

KC INVESTMENTS, LLC VS Lopez

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 KC INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lopez. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0095

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KC INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

Lopez, Kimberly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARROLL, JOSEPH W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: KC INVESTMENTS, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 910 16TH STREET, APT G WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: Lopez, Kimberly; Party: Names: KC INVESTMENTS, LLC; Lopez, Kimberly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION AND APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Comment: FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY POSTING AND MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY POSTING AND MAILING [CCP 415.45]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KC INVESTMENTS, LLC; Served: 05/03/20177:22 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less