Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 17:02:12 (UTC).

KBR DBA RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES VS ESQUIVEL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2012 KBR DBA RASH CURTIS ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESQUIVEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6940

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KBR

RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES

Defendant

ESQUIVEL, ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OLIVEIRA

OLIVEIRA, DUANE S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: $673.13 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for KBR (PL-1). Received from KBR, check no(s) 7103. Receipt #711454 for amount of $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Docket180C Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for KBR (PL-1). Received from KBR, check no(s) 7103. Receipt #711454 for amount of $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: AS TO: ROSA ESQUIVEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: COSTS: $411.00 INTEREST: $68.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: COSTS: $261.00 INTEREST: $48.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/MONEY/VG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO/MONEY/ VG

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 10/29/12 ~ calid=2035471 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:03/07/2013, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:VICKYG, SystemDate:10/16/2012 10:55:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET WHO SERVED:ROSA ESQUIVEL HOW SERVED:PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED:10/18/12 FEE:$70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: >>>>NOTICE CORRECTED TO REFLECT 1:30 PM NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 05, 2013 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 05, 2013 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: >>>>NOTICE CORRECTED TO REFLECT 1:30 PM NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 07, 2013 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 07, 2013 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION ON LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for KBR (PL-1). Received from RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 5134. Receipt #677149 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 775

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliveira, Duane S