This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 09:20:03 (UTC).

KATHY WISE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 KATHY WISE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3207

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WANSTREET, JULIANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need date of death of predeceased spouse. 3. Need name and date of death of predeceased parents. 4. Brother, Michael Aiello filed Waiver Releasing as Beneficiary on 12/22/17 and waived his interest from estate. Need waivers from all heirs, including siblings and cousins, or in alternative, a minimum bond to be set by the Court.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 04/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need date of death of predeceased spouse. 3. Need name and date of death of predeceased parents. 4. Brother, Michael Aiello filed Waiver Releasing as Beneficiary on 12/22/17 and waived his interest from estate. Need waivers from all heirs, including siblings and cousins, or in alternative, a minimum bond to be set by the Court.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 05/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILED

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 08/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - to stop foreclosure; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CREDITOR'S CLAIM

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDED CREDITOR'S CLAIM

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 05/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 05/09/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 08/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 08/14/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Ruling

Ruling 03/18/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 3/17/2020, HEARING CONTINUED *** RE: First and final account, waiver of account, report of administrator and petition for allowance of statutory fees to the attorney and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/18/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Verified supplement part 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketVerification - Comment: Verification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Verified Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 3/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: RE 12200 STATUS REPORT OR PETITION TO CLOSE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Final: 1,702,082.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Comment: First and final account, waiver of account, report of administrator and petition for allowance of statutory fees to the attorney and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 08/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 08/14/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver releasing as beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver of bond by heir or beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: of Proposed action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver releasing as beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Verified supplement to petition for letters of administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need date of death of predeceased spouse. 3. Need name and date of death of predeceased parents. 4. Brother, Michael Aiello filed Waiver Releasing as Beneficiary on 12/22/17 and waived his interest from estate. Need waivers from all heirs, including siblings and cousins, or in alternative, a minimum bond to be set by the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action - Comment: Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver releasing as beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE