This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:17:58 (UTC).

KATHY JAYNE WILSON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 KATHY JAYNE WILSON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSON, MARY JEANETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YOUNG, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need name and date of death of predeceased father.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of petition to administer estate to attorney Michael R. Young

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for letters; returned via attorney's outbasket

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need name and date of death of predeceased father.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition to determine succession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Comment: Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of petition to administer estate to attorney Michael R. Young

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for letters; returned via attorney's outbasket

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.