This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/22/2023 at 08:38:26 (UTC).

KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1710

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO

BRIUS, LLC

FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, LLC

BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC (DBA THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF BAKERSFIELD)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADBURY KENT L.

Defendant Attorneys

HOROUPIAN GRACE Y

JENKINS NATHANIEL H.

HAYWARD LAURA E.

BABAJANIAN AREEN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

05/09/2023: Case Management Conference

Report

04/28/2023: Report

Case Management Statement

04/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint

04/13/2023: Answer to Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

03/20/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Electronic Rejection Notice

03/14/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Amendment to Complaint

03/02/2023: Amendment to Complaint

Case Management Conference

01/09/2023: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint

10/07/2022: Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint

09/07/2022: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/23/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

07/18/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Electronic Rejection Notice

07/13/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Complaint

07/08/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

07/13/2022: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/08/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Report; Comment: JOINT STATUS REPORT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: for Plaintiff, Kassidy Ali; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC (DBA THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF BAKERSFIELD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Amended Summons; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: AMENDED SUMMONS; 1.) Plaintiff's name is incomplete; it must conform to the complaint. 2.) Defendant's DBA is incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amendment to Complaint; Comment: DOE 1: BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC (DBA THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF BAKERSFIELD); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Comment: Los Angeles counse case no. 21STCV20904 and 21STCV21127. San Bernardino court case no. CIVSB116994; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: for Defendants, Brius Management Co. & Brius, LLC; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO|DEFENDANT - BRIUS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: DEFENDANT FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, LLC S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO|DEFENDANT - BRIUS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Favorite Healthcare Staffing, LLC, via mail service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Summons: Party names do not conform to Complaint, please see DOES information. Court address needs to be corrected. Effective January 3, 2022 the Civil Department is located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301. Please correct and re-file into the existing case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/26/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KASSIDY ALI, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less