This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:38 (UTC).

KARL'S HARDWARE VS SCHMAL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 KARL'S HARDWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHMAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8405

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARL'S HARDWARE

Defendants

SCHMAL, RAYMOND

GRUNWALD, JAIME

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2013
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: FUL SAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ERIC LANDSGAARD APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF: KARL'S HARDWARE. RAYMOND SCHMAL (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR RECEIVED FROM THE PLAINTIFF AND FILED IN OPEN COURT. ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION WITNESSES ARE EXCLUDED FROM THE COURTROOM. DONNA PANELLIE: OFFICE MANAGER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. KARL'S HARDWARE (PL-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER 1 HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION IS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF: KARL'S HARDWARE AGAINST DEFENDANT: RAYMOND SCHMAL FOR PRINCIPAL $2700.00 COSTS $50.00. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. EXHIBITS RETURNED TO OFFERING PARTIES. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: KARL'S HARDWARE; Defendant: SCHMAL, RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • 853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for KARL'S HARDWARE (PL-1). Received from KARL'S HARDWARE, check no(s) 21014. Receipt #710285 for amount of $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less