This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:01 (UTC).

KAREN LACKS DBA KAREN LACKS & CO REAL ESTATE VS MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 KAREN LACKS DBA KAREN LACKS CO REAL ESTATE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5693

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN LACKS DBA KAREN LACKS & CO REAL ESTATE

Defendants

MARQUEZ, RODOLFO

MARQUEZ, MELISSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: KAREN LACKS DBA KAREN LACKS & CO REAL ESTATE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 105 REAL ROAD #M BAKERSFIELD CA 93309; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: MARQUEZ, RODOLFO; MARQUEZ, MELISSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURN VIA EFFECTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: RODOLFO MARQUEZ & MELISSA MARQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: RODOLFO MARQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession Mailed to Plaintiff - Comment: /Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 105 REAL ROAD #M, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KAREN LACKS DBA KAREN LACKS & CO REAL ESTATE; Served: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.