This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:15:06 (UTC).

KANDLEY ET AL VS NUNG ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 KANDLEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NUNG. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., McNamara, Brian M. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0528

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

McNamara, Brian M.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KANDLEY, JAMES

BREENE, GAILE

Defendants

NUNG, JOSEPH

KBS REAL ESTATE

KBS REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.

KBS REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA KBS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANKIN, L. PAUL, IV

Defendant Attorney

CARLSON, MARK C

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/11/2017: Judicial Officer: McNamara, Brian M.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER: PREVIOUSLY FILED ENDORSED DOCUMENTS CANNOT BE REFILED WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS; CANNOT ISSUE AN AMENDED SUMMONS WITH AN AMENDMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set concurrent. estimate 6 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: FCMC 06/04/18; JURY TRIAL 06/04/18; T/E 6 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACITON OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/11/2017: Judicial Officer: McNamara, Brian M.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: CARLSON LAW GROUP Date of Letter: 08/22/17 Re:POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: *****STRICKEN SEE RULING DATED 7/6/17*********** AS TO KBS REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. DBA KBS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to KBS Real Estate Services, Inc. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to KBS Real Estate Services, Inc. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS; CANNOT ISSUE AN AMENDED SUMMONS WITH AN AMENDMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: KBS REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/08/2017; Served: 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/27/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.