This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2021 at 07:19:22 (UTC).

KAJBEROUNI VS BEAR VALLE COMMUNITY SERVICES

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 KAJBEROUNI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEAR VALLE COMMUNITY SERVICES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2844

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAJBEROUNI, RAFFI H

Defendants

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY

BEAR VALLEY POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS, MICHELLE L.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/18/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/18/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS, MICHELLE L.