This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:19 (UTC).

JUSTIN TERREL VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 JUSTIN TERREL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0712

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERREL, JUSTIN

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHOV, STEVE B

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT, MATTHEW M

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 10/03/2017: Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Ruling on: Demurrer heard 09/20/17; jw

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 09/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/15/17; Amended Notice 9/1/17 Defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY Demurrer to First Amended Complaint ResID: 25666 ************************************************** TENTATIVE: OVERRULE DEMURRER.. ANSWER TO BE SERVED AND FILED WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS. ***************************************************

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Demurrer to First Amended Complaint - Motion is filed but not calendared.

Demurrer

Demurrer 06/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/22/17, by Defendant. Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint. ResID: 24807. ***************************************************** TENTATIVE; SUSTAIN DEMURRER WITH LEAVE TO AMEND TO THE THIRD, FOURTH, AND FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION. CCP SECTION 430.10(e) AND ECONOMIC LOSS RULE. COMPLAINT FAILS TO ALLEGE TORTIOUS CAUSATION OF PERSONAL INJURY OR PROPERTY DAMAGE NOT SUBJECT TO THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION. TWENTY (20) DAYS TO SERVE AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO THE ABOVE CAUSES OF ACTION, ONLY. *****************************************************

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 8 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS (D-4) FCMC & TD 8/6/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketMotion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 3/9/18 Plaintiff, JUSTIN TERREL Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses ResID: 29344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: REGARDING PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES; DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY SHALL PAY TO PLAINTIFF THE TOTAL SUM OF $20,960.00 IN ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES. SAID PAYMENT IS TO BE MAILED TO PLAINITFFS COUNSELS OFFICE IN LOS ANGELES PER STATUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Taking Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: in support of Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer) - Comment: of Kevin M. Raya in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Demurrer to Complaint RE: Meet and Confer Pursuant to CCP 430.41 (a)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: and Demurrer to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less