This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:45:34 (UTC).

JUDICIAL COUNCIL COORDINATION PROCEEDING NO. 4922 - PATTERSON BUILDERS MECHANIC'S LIEN CASES

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 JUDICIAL COUNCIL COORDINATION PROCEEDING NO 4922 - PATTERSON BUILDERS MECHANIC'S LIEN CASES was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4922

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATTERSON BUILDERS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Respondents

PRBC 6AB LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PHILLIPS RANCH DEVELOPMENT LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Y.K. AMERICA GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DELANO RETAIL CENTER WEST, LLC, CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BCM WEST CORPORATION DBA BMC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DSCH CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC DBA FAR WEST CAPITAL

JAXON ENTERPRISES DBA DEEB CREEK ASPHALT

SHAMROCK GROUP, INC DBA SHAMROCK PAVING, INC

DMP2 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

TOWN CENTER COURTYARD, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DMP 1A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

TOWN CENTER VILLAGE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY

DMP 1C LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DMP 1B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CARLTON, ANDREW C

ALBEROLA, EDWARD

Respondent Attorneys

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

TKACH, JOHN A

FINCH, P RANDOLPH, Jr.

LUBIC, MICHAEL B

CESAR, TYLER J.

BANDELL, LEONARD

QUALL, MATTHEW W

MADONI, STEPHEN ANGELO

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 01/19/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition

Petition 06/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for coordination; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ALBEROLA, EDWARD; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent: BCM WEST CORPORATION DBA BMC A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G; Respondent; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

Ruling

05/22/17 MO: Ruling on JCCP 4922: Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Ruling on Judicial Council Coordination Proceeding No. 4922

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/19/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: assigning coordination trial judge (signed by Chief Justice of California and Chair of the Judicial Council)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Deborah Collier-Tucker (Judicial Council of California) Date of Letter: 9-27-17 Date letter received: 10-6-17 Re:Order authorizing coordination trial judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: JOHN A. TKACH Date of Letter: 10/4/17 Re: JUDICIAL COUNCIL COORDINATION PROCEEDING NO, 4922

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: CRC 3.1312 Summary of Response Re [Proposed] Coordination Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 06/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for coordination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service (Judicial Council)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketNon-Opposition - Comment: (Notice of)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: (copy) of order assigning coordination motion judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Edward Alberola in support of petitioner Patterson Builders' petition for coordination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Re: KC068554 - Plaintiff and petitioner Patterson Builders' notice of errata re petition for coordination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Re: KC068554- Plaintiff Patterson Builder's notice of submission of petition for coordination of complex actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Re: EU09255 - Plaintiff Patterson Builders' notice of submission of petition for coordination of complex actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Re: EU9358- Plaintiff Patterson Builders' notice of submission of petition for coordination of complex actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Re: BCV-16-101282- Plaintiff Patterson Builders' notice of submission of petition for coordination of complex actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Cross-defendant Patterson Builders' notice of submissionj of petition for coordination of complex actions (CRC Rule 3.521(a))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Re: KC068554- Plaintiff Patterson Builders' petition for coordination of complex actions

    Read MoreRead Less