This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/04/2022 at 04:52:36 (UTC).

JUAREZ VS KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 JUAREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KS INDUSTRIES, L P. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1177

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ, RAULLY

Defendant

KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN BEN

Defendant Attorney

EGLEY JOHN T

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/07/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Case Status Conference

04/20/2022: Case Status Conference

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/01/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Stipulation and Order

08/17/2022: Stipulation and Order

Notice

04/27/2022: Notice

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice

10/19/2021: Notice

Stipulation and Order

10/18/2021: Stipulation and Order

Declaration

09/03/2021: Declaration

Declaration

09/03/2021: Declaration

Notice of Motion

09/03/2021: Notice of Motion

Answer to Complaint

07/16/2021: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

07/01/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

07/01/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Order to Show Cause

05/25/2021: Order to Show Cause

Complaint

05/24/2021: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

05/25/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: Ben Rothman, AttyRE: Request for Dismissal- Unable to process, this case has been stayed since 10/18/2021. A filing regarding status of arbitration or lifting of stay is required.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Joint Status Report and Request to Continue Status Conference, Granted; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.|PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: (Joint) to Submit Case to Binding Arbitration and Stay Civil Action; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Ellen Connelly Cohen in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Phillip Clarke in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay ProceedingsHearing Date: 10/26/21 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KS INDUSTRIES, L.P. f/k/a KEN SMALL CONSTRUCTION, INC. TO PLAINTIFF S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: DEFENDANT - KS INDUSTRIES, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Ken Small Construction, Inc. via sub service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to KS Industries, L.P. via sub service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/07/2021Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JUAREZ, RAULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KS INDUSTRIES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant