This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 08:04:09 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS MILLS

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2922

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendants

MILLS

MILLS, BETHANY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISOZAKI, RYOTA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: OSC on 1/4/21 is vacated. OSC on 6/14/21 remains

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLS LLC CATALINA CARPET is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISOZAKI RYOTA