Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 06:23:16 (UTC).

JOYCE DBA JOYCE PROPERTIES VS MARTIN

Case Summary

On 01/18/2013 JOYCE DBA JOYCE PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0335

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOYCE, GARY

JOYCE PROPERTIES

Defendant

MARTIN, JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2013
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: FEE: $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: DISMISSAL DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/12/2013 VG ~ calid=2185239 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:04/18/2013, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:5, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:VICKYG, SystemDate:3/7/2013 11:33:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: JAMES MARTIN & AMY BUMGARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO: JAMES MARTIN & AMY BUMGARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO: AMY BUMGARDNER BY: POSTING FEE: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO: JAMES MARTIN BY: POSTING FEE: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketNP1820 - Comment: Department: AT Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS RECUSES HIMSELF/HERSELF. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case - Comment: TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: You are hereby notified that the above entitled matter was transferred to LAMONT COURT 12022 MAIN STREET, LAMONT, CA 93241 on 3/1/2013 . Calendar Notes: TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: You are hereby notified that the above entitled matter was transferred to LAMONT COURT 12022 MAIN STREET, LAMONT, CA 93241 on 3/1/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Docket185D Pmt: Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for JOYCE, GARY (PL-1). Received from JPST LLC, check no(s) 1696. Receipt #704512 for amount of $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Apr 29, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CRAIG PHILLIPS Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Apr 29, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CRAIG PHILLIPS Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for JOYCE, GARY (PL-1). Received from GARY JOYCE, check no(s) 1664. Receipt #698083 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 737

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 104 EASTERN AVENUE, TAFT, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less