This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:19:48 (UTC).

JOY LOU TANGEMAN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 JOY LOU TANGEMAN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TANGEMAN, SCOTT A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANLEY, KEVIN M

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 02/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCreditors Claim - Comment: $unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketLetters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketWill Admitted - Comment: BRW-20-001001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 02/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 2/6/20 @8:30am in Div P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Request to Set Hearing Not Later Than 30 Days From Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: Confidential Driver's License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: Will number BRW-20-001001; will dated 2/9/2012; six (6) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.