This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:21 (UTC).

JOSEPHINE GOODEN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 JOSEPHINE GOODEN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2298

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GRAYS, TIMMIE

GRAYS, DONALD

FANNING, TAMMIE

GOODEN, ERIC

GRAYS, RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FODEN, JAMES E, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Petition to Determine Succession

Petition to Determine Succession 10/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Will gives "a little money" to Donald & a vehicle to Eric. What is the disposition of money & vehicle? Need verified supplement. 2. Property listed in Attachment 2 to I&A is inconsistent with property which petitioners request to succeed in Attachment 11. 3. How do petitioners, Ronald Grays, Donald Grays & Tammie Fanning request to succeed to the property (Ronnie, Don, & T. Fanning)? 4. Type version of Holographic Will is inconsistent with Holographic Will attached to petition. 5. Need Proof of Holographic Instrument (form DE-135).; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: FODEN, JAMES E, Jr.; Petitioner; Attorney: FODEN, JAMES E, Jr.; Petitioner; Attorney: FODEN, JAMES E, Jr.; Petitioner; Attorney: FODEN, JAMES E, Jr.; Petitioner; Attorney: FODEN, JAMES E, Jr.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Holographic Instrument and Verified Supplement...Sent Via Mail (SASE)

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned to attorney address of record; no SASE provided

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketOrder Determining Succession - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Petition to Determine Succession 10/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES- 1. Will gives "a little money" to Donald & a vehicle to Eric. What is the disposition of money & vehicle? Need verified supplement. 2. Property listed in Attachment 2 to I&A is inconsistent with property which petitioners request to succeed in Attachment 11. 3. How do petitioners, Ronald Grays, Donald Grays & Tammie Fanning request to succeed to the property (Ronnie, Don, & T. Fanning)? 4. Type version of Holographic Will is inconsistent with Holographic Will attached to petition. 5. Need Proof of Holographic Instrument (form DE-135).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Verified Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Holographic Instrument - Comment: Proof of Holographic Instrument

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Holographic Instrument and Verified Supplement...Sent Via Mail (SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration re lost will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Verified supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Comment: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned to attorney address of record; no SASE provided

    Read MoreRead Less