This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:37:40 (UTC).

JOSEPHINE A MAYER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 JOSEPHINE A MAYER DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2680

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LONDON, WILLIAM O

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 02/06/20, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed. COMMENT/NOTE - 2. Order, Letters, and $400,000 have not been filed.

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 02/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letter

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Hearing,...First Legal Bin

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 04/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - ***SUPPLEMENT FILED 11/14/17 & REVIEWED, THE FOLLOWING NOTES REMAIN - REVISED NOTES - 1. Need original exemplified/certified copy of Will. 2. Per #8 of petition, list all persons mentioned in decedent's will or any codicil, whether living or deceases. Need proof of mailing to Ray Garman III.

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need original exemplified/certified copy of Will. 2. Need proof of mailing to Ray Garman III.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via First Legal Support Services

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: RE: 12200 STATUS REPORT OR PETITION TO CLOSE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ORDER TO APPEAR/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: William O London to appear before the court and show the condition of the estate and the reasons why the estate cannot be distributed and closed pursuant to PC 12202, and why sanctions should not be imposed up to $1,500.00 pursuant to CCP 177.5 for failure to follow court orders, failure to file order, letters and bond pursuant to the court's order of February 15, 2019, and failure to appear at today's hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 02/20/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 02/06/20, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed. COMMENT/NOTE - 2. Order, Letters, and $400,000 have not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 02/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition for probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Filing of original exemplified will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 04/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - ***SUPPLEMENT FILED 11/14/17 & REVIEWED, THE FOLLOWING NOTES REMAIN - REVISED NOTES - 1. Need original exemplified/certified copy of Will. 2. Per #8 of petition, list all persons mentioned in decedent's will or any codicil, whether living or deceases. Need proof of mailing to Ray Garman III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 04/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Second supplement to petition for probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need original exemplified/certified copy of Will. 2. Need proof of mailing to Ray Garman III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: to Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 11/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via First Legal Support Services

    Read MoreRead Less