This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:28 (UTC).

JOSEPH GRAHAM TAUTKUS DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 JOSEPH GRAHAM TAUTKUS DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2299

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITMAN, KATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WELLS, ANNA F

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WELLS, ANNA F

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: status report (pc 12200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketFinal Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order settling first and final report of administrator on waiver of accounting and petition for final distribution, and for waiver of compensation to administrator and allowance of compensation to attorney for ordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Responsive Declaration of Attorney Anna Wells to Probate Calendar Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 04/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Comment: First and final report of administrator on waiver of accounting and petition for final distribution, and for waiver of compensation to administrator and allowance of compensation to attorney for ordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Partial 2 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Partial 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketCreditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: 5/19/17 at 9:00 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 05/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 05/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less