This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:22:12 (UTC).

JOSE HECTOR ARMENTA VEGA DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 JOSE HECTOR ARMENTA VEGA DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4892

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ARMENTA, MARIA

THOMPSON, F L

Decedent

ARMENTA VEGA, JOSE HECTOR

Not Classified By Court

ARMENTA, ARNOLDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Not Classified By Court Attorney

VAN SCIVER, KURT D

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC re Petition to Request an Accounting of the Estate Funds Pursuant to Probate Code Section 8873 and to give Estate Funds to the Authorized Representative; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE; Objector; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Case Management Conference re: Petition for Accounting; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE; Objector; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Petition

Petition 08/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition to request an accounting of the estate funds pursuant to probate code section 8873 and to give any estate funds to the authorized representative; Parties Present Petitioner: ARMENTA, MARIA; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: ARMENTA, MARIA; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 06/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Status report [PC 12200] NOTE- 1. Need notice of hearing with required language per PC 12201 (B).

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 09/01/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 8/10/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Compliance Hearing

COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 11/17/15, the Letters, $280,000 bond & color copy of petitioner's Driver's License have not been filed.

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 070215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters MO 052815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 03/01/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: petition to request an accounting of the estate funds, etc. 09/13/18 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner: ARMENTA, MARIA; Objector: ARMENTA, ARNOLDO; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection to petition to determine ownership of the property located at 813 Cannon

Order to Show Cause

Case Management Conference 08/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OSC Maria Armenta is to appear before the court and show the condition of the estate and the reasons why the estate cannot be distributed and closed, and why sanctions should not be imposed up the $1,500.00 pursuant to CCP 177.5 for failure to follow court orders. 08/23/2018 CALENDAR #5

Case Management Conference

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 07/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: petition to request an accounting of the estate funds, etc. 07/26/18 CALENDAR #1

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion...returned via attorney out basket

Review

(3) Review, Petition and Hearing on Status Report 03/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Petiton to request an accounting of the estate funds pursuant to PROB 8873 and to give any estate funds to the authorized representative 03/08/18 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Objector; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Court Trial 02/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING 02/22/18 CALENDAR #2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Termination - Petition for Termination 08/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 8/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: 12200 status report or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Termination - Petition for Termination 07/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing to Rosa Martinez-Genzon per Request for Special Notice filed 10/23/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 7/3/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 03/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 03/01/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketPetition for Termination - Comment: of Further Proceedings and for Discharge of the Personal Representative and for an Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Pro Per New Attorney:Gerald H. Oldfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice - Comment: Request for Special Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Copy of ID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 070215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Docket4020 Petition for Letters - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters MO 052815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 5/28/2015 @ 9:00AM IN DIV. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Docket874W PMT: Probate New Suit - 1st Petition <$250,000 GC - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for ARMENTA, MARIA (PE-1). Received from THOMPSON LAW, check no(s) 2552. Receipt #833867 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY 5/28/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.