This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 11:31:54 (UTC).

JORDAN VS DURAN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 JORDAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DURAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0100

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORDAN, KEITH

Defendant

DURAN, EFRAIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JORDAN, KEITH; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 7909 Dunnsmere St Lamont, CA 93241 Kern; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: DURAN, EFRAIN; Party: Names: JORDAN, KEITH; DURAN, EFRAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 7909 Dunnsmere St Lamont, CA 93241 Kern Returned Via In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Efrain Duran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to Unknown Tenants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to Efrain Duran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: attempted service as to Unnamed Tenants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JORDAN, KEITH; Served: 12/02/20152:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 7909 DUNNSMERE ST LAMONT, CA 93241 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less