Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:31 (UTC).

JONES VS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 JONES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0957

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, SUSIE

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Minute Order- Unlawful detainer trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Answer filed by John Gutierrez. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Plaintiff: JONES, SUSIE; Defendant: GUTIERREZ, JOHN

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JONES, SUSIE; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: GUTIERREZ, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Mediation Agreement - Comment: **Signed by all parties and Commissioner Etienne**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Minute Order- Unlawful detainer trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Answer filed by John Gutierrez. Time estimate 30 minutes.; Parties Present Plaintiff: JONES, SUSIE; Defendant: GUTIERREZ, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by Clerk as to John Gutierrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Shriver Case - Mediation Offered But Not Accepted By Parties - Comment: Landlord did not return call.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Shriver Case - Referred to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by Clerk as to John Gutierrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Demurrer - Comment: by Defendant to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer by Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Suppoert of Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JONES, SUSIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 442 Sycamore Bakersfield, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less