This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/01/2020 at 09:16:35 (UTC).

JONES VS GOMEZ (C)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 JONES filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GOMEZ C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1012

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES, PAMELA A.

Respondent

GOMEZ, CASAUNDRA A.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 01/02/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: EXP 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 01/02/20 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.