This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:19:10 (UTC).

JOINT HEIRS FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/04/2015 JOINT HEIRS FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2652

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

BUCKNER, LILELLEN B

BUCKNER, CHARLES E

MCWHORTER, CHERYL

CEDARLEAF, KARLA

Petitioner and Respondent

MCWHORTER, CHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

MACIAS, ROMAN

BOYLE, STEPHEN H

SHERAK, DAVID A.

Duff, Jeany Anne

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 02/23/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: RULING ON SUA SPONTE MOTION OF THE COURT VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES SET FOR HEARING ON MARCH 6, 2018

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Resignation returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objections returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

Further Case Management Conference

(2) Further Case Management Conference and Petition 05/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - CMC on Petition for Instructions and First Account; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Ruling

05/03/2017 MO: Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Order

4/25/17 MO(3): Motion for Order: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PETITIONER CHARLES BUCKNER TO PROVIDE VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION AGAINST PETITIONER AND HIS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD, CLIFFORD & BROWN, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY 4/25/17 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Motion

Motion (3) 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Compelling Petitioner Charles Buckner to Provide Verified Responses to Demand For Production of Documents and Things, Set Two and Request for Monetary Sanction Against Petitioner and His Attorneys of Record, Clifford & Brown, Jointly and Severally; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 3/16/2017 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Petition

Petition 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER 3/16/2017 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Petition

Petition 02/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: *** MATTER NOT REVIEWED. TO BE CONTINUED IN COURT. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS NECESSARY *** PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Motion

(3) Further Case Management Conference 01/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING LILELLEN BUCKNER AND RHONDA WOOD TO ATTEND AND TESTIFY AT DEPOSITION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,060 AGAINST DEPONENTS AND THEIR ATTORNEY MICHAEL O DELL, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN THE SUPPORT THEREOF 01/31/17 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Matter continued to be heard concurrent with the discovery motions currently set for 12/22/2016.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: Duff, Jeany Anne

Motion

12/8/16 MO: Motion: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MATTER IS PROCEEDING ON SECOND AMENDED PETITION TO BE HEARD ON 12/22/16 Petitioner's Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for protective order regarding the deposition of Charles Buckner; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Ruling

Ruling 11/10/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/19/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS AND FIRST ACCOUNT (PC 17200); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Objector: CEDARLEAF, KARLA

Petition

MO Petition for instructions and first account: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Objector: CEDARLEAF, KARLA; Respondent; Attorney: SHERAK, DAVID A.; Petitioner; Attorney: SHERAK, DAVID A.

Petition

Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Respondent; Attorney: SHERAK, DAVID A.; Petitioner; Attorney: SHERAK, DAVID A.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for instructions and first account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petitoin for instructions and first account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for instructions and first account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for instructions and first account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: PETITION OF CHERYL MCWHORTER FOR: 1. ORDER COMPELLING CO-TRUSTEES TO REDRESS BREACH OF TRUST; 2. DECLARATION INVALIDATING REACQUISITION & SUBSTITUTION OF SUB-TRUST ASSETS; & 3. RECOVERY OF TRUST PROPERTY WRONGFULLY TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for instructions and first account

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: VOGT RESNICK SHERAK LLP Date of Letter: 10/9/16 Re: Joint heirs family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Motion...returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/19/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS AND FIRST ACCOUNT (PC 17200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - MO Petition for instructions and first account: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketObjection/Opposition (Probate) - Comment: Preliminary Response and Objections to Petition for Instruction and First Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketResponse - Comment: and Objections to Petition for Instructions and First Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 3/16/2016 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketProbate Documents - Requested By: BUCKNER, CHARLES E, BUCKNER, LILELLEN B; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for instructions and First account

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.