This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 09:27:34 (UTC).

JOHNSON VS JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 JOHNSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHNSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0301

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, BETTY ANN

Respondent

JOHNSON, CORNELL DARIAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: corrected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PER COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.