This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:49:28 (UTC).

JOHNSON-BONE VS MARTIN

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 JOHNSON-BONE filed an Other lawsuit against MARTIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1851

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON-BONE, LORI D.

Respondent

MARTIN, PHILLIP W.

 

Court Documents

Petition

Petition 07/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND RELIEF THROUGH SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Parties Present Petitioner: JOHNSON-BONE, LORI D.; Respondent: MARTIN, PHILLIP W.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 07/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND RELIEF THROUGH SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Points and Authorities in Oppostion to Plaintiff's Petition for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Plaintiffs' Response to Real Party in Interest Fidelity National Title Insurance Company's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Petition for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; and Declaration of Michael T. Colliau in Support Thereof; Plaintiffs' Response to Objections to Plaintiffs' Failure to File Separate Statement; Plaintiffs' Response to Evidentiary Objections and Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees - Comment: RE: First Paper - Opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketObjections - Comment: Real Party in Interest National Title Insurance Company's EVIDENTIARY Objections in Support of its Opposition to Plainitiff's Petition for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: Real Party in Interest National Title Insurance Company's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Petition for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketObjections - Comment: Real Party in Interest Fidelity National Title Insurance Company's Objections in Support of its Opposition Regarding Plaintiffs' Failure to File a Separate Statement Support Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: Real Party in Interest Fidelity National Title Insurance Company's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Petition for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Ajudication; and Declaration of Michael T. Collau in Support Thereof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JOHNSON-BONE, LORI D.; Served: 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND RELIEF THROUGH SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less