Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:29:48 (UTC).

JOHN MILTON BELCHER, Sr. DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 JOHN MILTON BELCHER, Sr DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2471

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

BELCHER, BEVERLY

BELCHER, LOASTER H

BELCHER, LOASTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

HUBER, JONATHAN P

YOUNG, MICHAEL R

ABHARI, SHIVA

AVANESIAN, MICHAEL

KHACHATRYAN, ISAHAK

 

Court Documents

Petition

Petition 03/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition to determine title to and require transfer of personal property to estate [Prob. code 850(a)(2)(D)]

Petition

Petition 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition for revocation of probate of purported Will; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HUBER, JONATHAN P; Petitioner; Attorney: YOUNG, MICHAEL R

Petition

Petition 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING: Petition for revocation of probate of purported Will Notes: 1. There is no proof of service on file for Sandra Belcher. (Probate Code section 8271); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HUBER, JONATHAN P

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Response and objection.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice and acknowledgment of receipt returned to attorney via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice and acknowledgment of receipt returned to attorney via outbasket

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE - 1. Petition refers to decedent being survived by an "estranged spouse" & a domestic partner (not registered per #5a), however decedent states in Will at time of execution he's "unmarried". Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HUBER, JONATHAN P

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via SASE

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administration pursuant to PC 1220 et seq. or petition to close estate

Petition for Fees

Petition for Fees 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

Ruling

Ruling 11/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

Court Trial 11/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: re: petition for revocation of probate of purported will

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 11/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE: PETITION FOR REVOCATION OF PROBATE OF PURPORTED WILL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: returned to Beverly Belcher

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING RE: PC 12200 STATUS REPORT OR PETITION TO CLOSE ESTATE 10/19/18 CALENDAR #2

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 06/29/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 03/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administration pursuant to PC 1220 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order approving payment of statutory compensation; reimbursement of costs; and attorney fees for extraordinary services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Fees - Petition for Fees 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Amended 2/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Jonathan P. Huber to clear probate notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing to attorney Jonathan P. Huber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketLetters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketWill Admitted - Comment: Will BRW-17-01128

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE - 1. Petition refers to decedent being survived by an "estranged spouse" & a domestic partner (not registered per #5a), however decedent states in Will at time of execution he's "unmarried". Need clarification by way of verified supplement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 07/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-17-001128 4/7/17 Eleven (11) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABHARI SHIVA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AVANESIAN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHACHATRYAN ISAHAK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUBER, JONATHAN P