This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:45 (UTC).

JOHN JOSEPH CONDON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 JOHN JOSEPH CONDON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2305

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CONDON, BRID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILBURN, NOLEN P, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/11/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - ***SUPPLEMENT FILED 03/06/20 REVIEWED AND THE FOLLOWING NOTES REMAIN - NOTES - 1. Paragraph 3 indicates petitioner was granted "limited authority" which is inconsistent with 05/19/17 minute order and Letter issued 06/16/17. 2. Need Receipt of 2010 Chevrolet Cobalt from Lary James.

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 03/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 09/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Notice of Hearing filed 05/18/18 does not include required language per PC 12201(b).

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority COMMENT/NOTE- 1. Petitioner is a non-resident, therefore, bond to be set at $784, 000 and all funds to be maintained in California.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MILBURN, NOLEN P, Jr.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Will returned via Active Legal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/11/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - ***SUPPLEMENT FILED 03/06/20 REVIEWED AND THE FOLLOWING NOTES REMAIN - NOTES - 1. Paragraph 3 indicates petitioner was granted "limited authority" which is inconsistent with 05/19/17 minute order and Letter issued 06/16/17. 2. Need Receipt of 2010 Chevrolet Cobalt from Lary James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Third supplement to first and final account and report of executor, peition for settlement, for allowance of compensation for ordinary services and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Second supplement to first and final account and report of executor, petiiton for settlement, for allowance of compensation for ordinary services and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to first and final account and report of executor, petition for settlement for allowance of compensation for ordinary services and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 09/03/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Comment: Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketFinal Account and Report and Petition for Distribution - Comment: Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketNotice to Creditors - Comment: Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketBond Undertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketWill Admitted - Comment: BRW-17-001110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority COMMENT/NOTE- 1. Petitioner is a non-resident, therefore, bond to be set at $784, 000 and all funds to be maintained in California.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Will returned via Active Legal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less