This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 15:05:13 (UTC).

JOHN E GUNSTEN AND LOIS A GUNSTEN FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 JOHN E GUNSTEN AND LOIS A GUNSTEN FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2823

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WESTON, DENISE L

RUOSS, LU ANN

RUOSS, MERYL

Not Classified By Court

GUNSTEN, LOIS A

GUNSTEN, JOHN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HULSY, JAMES R

BOYLE, STEPHEN H

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause 08/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- RE DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR (1) REMOVAL OF CO-SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES; (2) APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE; (3) REQUIRING CO-SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES TO ACCOUNT; (4) FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND DAMAGES; (5) SURCHARGE; (6) REQUIRING MERYL H. RUOSS AS ATTORNEY-lN-FACT TO ACCOUNT 08/21/2019 CALENDAR #1

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OSC re: dismissal as to court trial re: first account and report of trustees. 06/21/2019 CALENDAR #2

Court Trial

Court Trial 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Court trial re: first account and report of trustees 06/11/2019 CALENDAR #2

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Final case management conference re: petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee; (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account; (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surcharge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account 06/06/2019 CALENDAR #1

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Further CMC Re: case management conference re: first account and report of trustees 05/24/2019 CALENDAR #2

Court Trial

Court Trial 04/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Trial RE: FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TRUSTEES 04/29/2019 CALENDAR #2

Final Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC re: petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee; (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account; (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surcharge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as Attorney-in-fact to Account 04/19/2019 CALENDAR #1

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING RE: FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TRUSTEES 02/21/19 CALENDAR #1

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING RE: FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TRUSTEES 01/24/19 CALENDAR #1

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 09/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Re First Account and Report of Trustee 09/26/2018 CALENDAR #2

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 09/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Re First Account and Report of Trustee 09/26/2018 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 06/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY First account and report of trustee 06/27/18 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Petition

Petition 04/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for: (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee; (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surcharge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H; Petitioner; Attorney: BOYLE, STEPHEN H

Petition

Petition 03/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- re: for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Petition

Petition 02/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for (1) Removal of Co-Successor Trustees; (2) Appointment of Successor Trustee; (3) Rquiring Co-Successor Trustees to Account; (4) For Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Damages; (5) Surcharge; (6) Requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as Attorney-in-Fact to Account

Petition

Petition 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

Petition

Petition 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HULSY, JAMES R

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: order to show cause re: dismissal of petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee; (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account; (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surcharge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as attorney-ln-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: order to show cause re: dismissal of first account and report of trustees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Settlement agreement, mutual release and order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 08/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- RE DISMISSAL OF FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TRUSTEES 08/21/2019 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 08/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- RE DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR (1) REMOVAL OF CO-SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES; (2) APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE; (3) REQUIRING CO-SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES TO ACCOUNT; (4) FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND DAMAGES; (5) SURCHARGE; (6) REQUIRING MERYL H. RUOSS AS ATTORNEY-lN-FACT TO ACCOUNT 08/21/2019 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OSC re: dismissal as to court trial re:petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account; (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surhcarge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as attorney-in-face to account 06/21/2019 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OSC re: dismissal as to court trial re: first account and report of trustees. 06/21/2019 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settlement Reached; Comment: court trial re: petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee; (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account; (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surcharge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settlement Reached; Comment: court trial re: first account and report of trustees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settlement Reached; Comment: court trial re: petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees; (2) appointment of successor trustee; (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account; (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages; (5) surcharge; (6) requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 06/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 06/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 03/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- re: for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketAccount and Report - Comment: First account and report of trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 02/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for (1) Removal of Co-Successor Trustees; (2) Appointment of Successor Trustee; (3) Rquiring Co-Successor Trustees to Account; (4) For Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Damages; (5) Surcharge; (6) Requiring Meryl H. Ruoss as Attorney-in-Fact to Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Petition for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 10/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Lodging of confidential estate planning documents in support of petition for (1) removal of co-successor trustees, (2) appointment of successor trustee, (3) requiring co-successor trustees to account (4) for breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) surcharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for (1) Removal of co-successor Trustees (2) Appointment of successor Trustee, (3) Requiring co-successor Trustees to account (4) For breach of fiduciary duty and damages (5) Surcharge (6) Requiring Meryl H Ruoss as attorney-in-fact to account

    Read MoreRead Less