This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:05 (UTC).

JOEL RUIZ ET AL VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 JOEL RUIZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2489

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUIZ, DANIELA

RUIZ, JOEL A.

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, GEORGE E.

Defendant Attorney

TRAN, TRANG T

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/02/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: of Reassignment by mail. As to American Honda Motor Co., Inc. via CT Corporation System.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Notice of Assignment and Hearings by mail. As to American Honda Motor Co., Inc. via CT Corporation System.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: Answer/Response Civil Unlimited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: ***THOMAS S. CLARK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/02/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less