This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:58:07 (UTC).

JOE W. GORMAN- MEMBER AT LARGE ET AL VS INYOKERN CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 JOE W GORMAN- MEMBER AT LARGE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against INYOKERN CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1062

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B. CHARLES RODRIGUES GONZALES- BOARD DIRECTOR, OF THE INYOKERN CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, INC.

JOE W. GORMAN- MEMBER AT LARGE

Defendants

TOM THOMPSON- BOARD DIRECTOR

JANE FISHER-BOARD DIRECTOR/ MEMBER

IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE CAPACITIES, AS PERSONS & DIRECTORS, & AS MEMBERS AT LARGE

EVAN DANIEL CARROLL-PRESIDENT

WALTER "WALLY" T. ERNST- BOARD DIRECTOR

INYOKERN CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, INC.

VICKI L. CARLE- BOARD DIRECTOR

ROGER H. CLINE- BOARD DIRECTOR

PAUL M. VANDERWERF- VICE PRESIDENT

VANDER WERF, PAUL M

INYOKERN CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, INC

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 11/07/2017 AND ON 11/28/2017 AND FAILING TO SERVE DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 1-2-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; APPLICATION AND REQUEST

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC. PLAINTIFF FTA ON 11/07/2017

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; MOTION

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; APPLICATION

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; SUMMONS RETURNED VIA USPS TO BOTH ADDRESSES PROVIDED BY PLAINTIFFS

Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 & CMC 11/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; THE ADDRESS ON SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT THAT WAS FILED 05/10/17; DUPLICATE FILING AS TO THE COMPLAINT. COMPLAINT WAS FILED 05/10/17

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) & demurrer 10/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/7/17 Defendant, PAUL M. VANDER WERF Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Default, Statement of Damages Ect. / Seek legal advise not Summons ever issued, proofs of service not acceptable, see Minute Order from 8/24/2017 and 9/12/2017. Not Valid filings.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE DOES NOT CONFORM TO RULES OF COURT 2.100 AS TO FORM AND FORMAT.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS. PARTIES ARE NOT LISTED ON THE SUMMONS AS THEY ARE ON THE COMPLAINT.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4TH CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FOR MULTIPLE FAILURES TO APPEAR AND FAILING TO SERVE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 11/07/2017 AND ON 11/28/2017 AND FAILING TO SERVE DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: SEE RULING DATED 1-2-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order Dated 1-2-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; APPLICATION AND REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PLAINTIFF FTA ON 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: AS TO JOE W. GORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: AS TO B. CHARLES RODRIGUES GONZALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees - Comment: NO FEE WAIVER OR FEE WAS SUBMITTED FOR PLAINTIFF B. CHARLES RODRIGUES GONZALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO JOE W. GORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS. PARTIES ARE NOT LISTED ON THE SUMMONS AS THEY ARE ON THE COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/24/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO JOE W. GORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less