This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 07:53:13 (UTC).

JOAQUINA LOPEZ MACIAS CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 JOAQUINA LOPEZ MACIAS CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2727

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MACIAS, JUANITA

Not Classified By Court

FAMILY COURT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 07/22/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: petition for appointment of conservator of the person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketA portion or all of the proceedings in this case - Comment: were not audio streamed due to containing confidential matters.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need Capacity Declaration. 2. Need original citation returned and filed. 3. Number 5 states proposed conservatee has been diagnosed with dementia. Number 1k in the petition regarding dementia is incomplete and Attachment Requesting Special Orders Regarding a Major Neurocognitive Disorder (form GC-313) is missing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned - Comment: HEARING DATE: 08/31/2021 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DIVISION: P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketFamily Court Services Investigator's Report - Comment: HRG: 08/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketFamily Court Services Supplemental Investigator's Report - Comment: HRG: 08/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 8/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Investigator - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Identification Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form - Comment: Confidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information - Comment: Confidential Supp Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDuties of Conservator - Comment: Duties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: Petitioner for Appointment of Conservator of the Person

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H