This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:22 (UTC).

JO ANN STEEL -VS- TAMARA L SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 JO ANN STEEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAMARA L SMITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3395

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEEL, JO ANN

Defendant

SMITH, TAMARA LORRAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELBER, JAMIE P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Judgment after Trial - Comment: KP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT - COSTS DO NOT MATCH MEMO. YOUR MEMO DOES NOT ASK FOR ATTORNEY FEES. YOU HAVE NOT LISTED THAT AN ATTORNEY APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF ON # 2B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for STEEL, JO ANN (PL-1). Received from STEEL, JO ANN, check no(s) 8134. Receipt #725231 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT, MEMO OF COSTS-JUDGMENT DATES INCORRECT, PLEASE CORRECT TO ADD RULING DATE, YOU MUST ADD AMOUNT OF COSTS TO JUDGMENT. MEMO OF COSTS DOES NOT GET ATTACHED TO JUDGMENT, POS INCOMPLETE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • NP1821 - Comment: Department: AK Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 06/03/2013 THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANT, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $-WAIVED-, COSTS $, ATTORNEY FEES $PER MEMORANDUM OF COST, MISC FEES $-WAIVED- FOR A TOTAL OF $TO BE DETERMINED. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL Department: AK Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL TAMARA LORRAINE SMITH (DE-1) APPEARS WITH JAMIE P GELBER. TAMARA LORRAINE SMITH (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. *********CASE UNDER SUBMISSION FOR RULING******* DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • 4154 Unlawful Detainer Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: To Be, Assigned; Hearing Time: 02:45 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: STEEL, JO ANN; Defendant: SMITH, TAMARA LORRAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: TAMARA LORRAINE SMITH HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 03/30/13 FEE FOR SERVICE: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED:ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED:JAMIE P GELBER C/O JO ANNE STEELE HOW SERVED:DEPOSITING IN THE US MAIL DATE SERVED:04/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Answer - Comment: -UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON May 13, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AK OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ To Be Assigned Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON May 13, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AK OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ To Be Assigned Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for STEEL, JO ANN (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICE OF JAMIE GELBER, check no(s) 2041. Receipt #709249 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 41

    Read MoreRead Less