Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:52:08 (UTC).

JIMENEZ VS ATCO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 JIMENEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ATCO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1315

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ, DONNA LYNN

Defendant

ATCO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/3/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: JIMENEZ, DONNA LYNN; Defendant: ATCO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal After Mediation(CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Michele Narramore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Dismissed without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/3/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: JIMENEZ, DONNA LYNN; Defendant: ATCO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to ATCO Property Management/Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JIMENEZ, DONNA LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA J BIN

    Read MoreRead Less