This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 17:56:39 (UTC).

JIM SEVIER DBA SERVIERS AUTO SUPPLY VS SALAZAR

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 JIM SEVIER DBA SERVIERS AUTO SUPPLY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALAZAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0062

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIM SEVIER DBA SERVIERS AUTO SUPPLY

Defendant

SALAZAR, RAMONA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: From Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JIM SEVIER DBA SERVIERS AUTO SUPPLY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 419 High Street Delano, CA 93215; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: SALAZAR, RAMONA; Party: Names: JIM SEVIER DBA SERVIERS AUTO SUPPLY; SALAZAR, RAMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (UD) - Comment: Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Ramona Salazar (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JIM SEVIER DBA SERVIERS AUTO SUPPLY; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.