This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 02:47:34 (UTC).

JEZZINI VS DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 JEZZINI filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 50. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1950

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEZZINI, JOHN

Defendant

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAVAN, JOHN T

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 12/05/2017 AND FAILING TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: CAVAN, JOHN T

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: "COMPLAINT DOES NOT NAME ANY DEFENDANTS"

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/6/17 Defendant, JOHN DOE NO. 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served Upon Facebook for and on Behalf of Special Appearing Doe No. 1 ResID: 28557

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amendment to Complaint returned via USPS

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 02/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 2-16-18 Moving Party: Defendant Ex-Parte Application and Motion to Stay Enforcement of January 18, 2018 Order on Doe 1's Motion to Quash Subpoena Served upon Facebook; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: CAVAN, JOHN T

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/6/17 Non Party, John Doe No 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum served upon Facebook ResID: 27039

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE; OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DUCES TECUM

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Document not necessary. Ex-Parte hearing has been vacated per request of moving party

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Application and Motion to Stay Enforcement of January 18, 2018 Order on Doe 1's Motion to Quash Subpoena Served upon FaceBook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Document not necessary. Ex-Parte hearing has been vacated per request of moving party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Request - Comment: to withdraw Ex-Parte Application to Stay Enforcement of the Order on Motion to Quash the Subpoena to Facebook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amendment to Complaint returned via USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 02/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 2-16-18 Moving Party: Defendant Ex-Parte Application and Motion to Stay Enforcement of January 18, 2018 Order on Doe 1's Motion to Quash Subpoena Served upon Facebook; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: CAVAN, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Ex Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Doe 1's Ex Parte Application and motion to stay enforcement of January 18, 2018 Order on Doe 1's Motion to Quash subpoena served upon facebook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Order Denying Motion - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED UPON FACEBOOK THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT Doe 1 Defendant's motion to quash Plaintiff's subpoena dues tecum served upon Facebook November 20, 2017 is DENIED; and, Facebook shall fully and properly respond to said subpoena. ****JUDGE THOMAS S. CLARK****2/6/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) - Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/6/17 Defendant, JOHN DOE NO. 1 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served Upon Facebook for and on Behalf of Special Appearing Doe No. 1 ResID: 28557

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • Brief - Comment: Supplemental brief in support of motion to quash subpoena duces tecum to facebook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Separate Statement - Comment: Separate statement in support of Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Joseph Pittera in support of Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum served upon Facebook Hearing Date: 11/13/17 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE; OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/05/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.