Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:55:40 (UTC).

JERRY J. DELOZIER, as Trustee of the James J. Chadwick Living Trust dated May 1, 2009 VS MARRIER

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 JERRY J DELOZIER, as Trustee of the James J Chadwick Living Trust dated May 1, 2009 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARRIER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0062

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JERRY J. DELOZIER, as Trustee of the James J. Chadwick Living Trust dated May 1, 2009

Defendant

MARRIER, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVA, WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

MO-Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JERRY J. DELOZIER, as Trustee of the James J. Chadwick Living Trust dated May 1, 2009; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1447 Brown Road Inyokern, CA 93527; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: MARRIER, MARY; Party: Names: MARRIER, MARY; JERRY J. DELOZIER, as Trustee of the James J. Chadwick Living Trust dated May 1, 2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - MO-Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Mary Marrier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: SILVA, WAYNE; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVA, WAYNE