This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 14:48:23 (UTC).

JEPSON ET AL VS CANUS CORPORATION, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 JEPSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CANUS CORPORATION, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2004

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEPSON, ERIK

JEPSON, AMANDA

Defendants

CANUS CORPORATION, INC.

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

BURKE, KRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

Complaint

08/27/2021: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

08/31/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

08/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

08/31/2021: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Settlement Unconditional

10/06/2021: Notice of Settlement Unconditional

Notice of Assignment / Case Management Conference

11/05/2021: Notice of Assignment / Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

11/22/2021: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

11/30/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Ruling

10/12/2021: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal with RFD; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, AMANDA|PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, ERIK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: with prejudice, entire action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, AMANDA|PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, ERIK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Assignment / Case Management Conference; Comment: By order of the presiding judge, the above entitled matter is assigned to the Honorable J. Eric Bradshaw for all purposes.It will be managed on the direct calendar program in "J" until its conclusion. Peremptory challenges, if any, must be madewithin the times set forth in CCP 170.6.Please include the initials JEB after the case number on all future pleadings filed in this case.Bakersfield Hearing Locations:Departments 1 through 18 are located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301Divisions A through L are located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301TO EACH PARTY AND THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD:This case is set for Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal by the Honorable J. Eric Bradshaw on December 03, 2021 at 8:30a.m. in Department/Division 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Settlement Unconditional; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, AMANDA|PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, ERIK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, AMANDA|PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, ERIK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, AMANDA|PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, ERIK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, AMANDA|PLAINTIFF - JEPSON, ERIK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less