This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 20:35:01 (UTC).

JENSEN ET AL VS SMART & FINAL STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2018 JENSEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1084

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JENSEN, CARL G.

JENSEN, ROSE

Defendant

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

10/07/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

07/01/2019: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

05/15/2019: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Ruling

05/13/2019: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

05/10/2019: Mandatory Settlement Conference

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

10/23/2019: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Electronic Rejection Notice

10/23/2019: Electronic Rejection Notice

Miscellaneous Filing

05/15/2019: Miscellaneous Filing

Miscellaneous Filing

05/10/2019: Miscellaneous Filing

Case Management Statement

10/18/2018: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorneys

09/20/2018: Substitution of Attorneys

Substitution of Attorneys

09/20/2018: Substitution of Attorneys

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/08/2018: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

06/01/2018: Answer to Complaint

Order to Show Cause

05/11/2018: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

05/11/2018: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/03/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

05/03/2018: Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: with prejudice as to entire action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Request for Dismissal: #1B is incomplete, it does not state what to dismiss; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 11; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 11; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 1; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Comment: Consent of parties or their lawyers to confer separately with settlement conference judge pro tem ret. Gary T. Friedman in department 1.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 1; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Comment: Consent of parties or their lawyers to confer separately with settlement conference judge pro tem ret. Gary T. Friedman in department 1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Settlement Conference Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Substitution of Attorneys; Comment: Former Attorney: ROSE JENSENNew Attorney: JONATHAN W. DOUGLASS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SMART & FINAL STORES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Substitution of Attorneys; Comment: Former Attorney: MATTHEW C. CLARKNew Attorney: PARTY REPRESENTING SELF*; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Substitution of Attorneys; Comment: Former Attorney: MATTHEW C. CLARKNew Attorney: PARTY REPRESENTING SELF*; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: AS TO SMART & FINAL STORES, INC. PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SMART & FINAL STORES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/24/2018Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, CARL G.|PLAINTIFF - JENSEN, ROSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less