This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/18/2018 at 04:16:00 (UTC).

JENKINS VS JENKINS

Case Summary

On 10/16/2015 JENKINS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JENKINS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Woodward, Cory J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0185

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Woodward, Cory J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENKINS, JULIE

Respondent

JENKINS, DON E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

5/11/16 MSC: Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: JENKINS, JULIE; Respondent: JENKINS, DON E

Mandatory Settlement Conference

05/04/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: JENKINS, JULIE; JENKINS, DON E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - 5/11/16 MSC: Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: JENKINS, JULIE; Respondent: JENKINS, DON E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - 05/04/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 5/4/16 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Department/Division:BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • At Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: At-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Declaration of disclosure FL140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PET and RESP are swapped on document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.