This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:01:52 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC VS VELASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/23/2015 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELASQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7496

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

VELASQUEZ, NORMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMOLO, ALLICIA B

3080 S Durango Dr #207

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; Awarded Against: VELASQUEZ, NORMA; Amount; Damages: $983.44; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $282.42; Attorney Fees: $196.69; Costs: $284.50; Total: $1747.05; Party: Names: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; VELASQUEZ, NORMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Request for Entry Of Default Judgment Request to Use Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration - Comment: Of Alicia B. Tomolon In Support of Interest CCP 2015.5 & In Support of Fees and Costs CCP 1033(b)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: As to Norma Velasquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Norma Velasquez

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Of Attorney In Support of Plaintiff's Request to Seal Plaintiff's Improper Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: In Support of Plaintiff's Request to Seal Plaintiff's Improper Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: An Order to Seal Plaintiff's Improper Complaint Hearing Date: 7/23/2015 Hearing Time: 1:30 PM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 17, 2016 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 17, 2016 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 24, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 24, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY, ALLICIA B. TOMOLO, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC (PL-1). Received from ALLIED COLLECTION SERVICE INC, check no(s) 037710. Receipt #830167 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less