This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 05:54:39 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC VS Sullivan

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 Jefferson Capital Systems LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sullivan. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0134

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC

Defendant

Sullivan, Dillan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HONG, ANGIE C

GOODMAN, JOHN M

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC; Awarded Against: Sullivan, Dillan; Amount; Damages: $2,074.68; Costs: $248.50; Total: $2323.18; Party: Names: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC; Sullivan, Dillan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less