This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:38:36 (UTC).

JEANNE LEONG DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 JEANNE LEONG DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W., Kendall, Andrew and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4954

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEONG, CHRISTINE GAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SHAW, ERROL G

BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/10/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Petition 01/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (CHRISTINE GAIL LEONG'S PETITION) 01/23/20 CALENDAR #02

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection, etc. to Attorney Stephen H. Boyle

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 10/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - (CHRISTINE GAIL LEONG'S PETITION) NOTES - 1. Postal code listed for petitioner on Notice of Hearing filed 07/31/19 is inconsistent with court records (93711 vs. 99711). Also, address listed for Amye Lynn Leong on same is inconsistent (345 vs. 340). 2. Need corrected Final I&A and Supplemental I&A per page 2 of petition. Unable to determine statutory fees until Corrected Final I&A and Supplemental I&A have been filed. 3. Statutory fee requested exceeds more than statutory fees allowed. 4. Need Written Agreement re apportionment of attorney's fees. 5. Page 3, line 19 - 20 indicates 1999 Honda automobile sold. Automobile not listed on Final I&A filed 11/10/15. 6. Gains re sale in Exhibit D, not Exhibit F as indicated on petition. 7. Total amount re statutory fee for attorney in page 5 does not equal $9,133.19. 8. Total POH amount listed on Summary of Account is inconsistent with amount listed on Exhibit L ($182,843.22 vs. 180,175.72). Need clarification via verified supplement. 9. Need clarification re $211.15 re cost advanced to attorney listed in Exhibit B. 10. Need itemization/description of "miscellaneous" listed on Exhibit J - page 2 for 12/10/14. 11. Need proof of service to attorney/Errol G. Shaw. 10/25/19 CALENDAR #02

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 07/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - (Christine Gail Leong's petition) SAME NOTE - 1. Notice of Hearing filed 12/03/18 indicates service is short. Need at least 15 days notice. Need new proof of mailing with required language per PC 12201(B) to Neal E Bartlett per Request for Special Notice filed 05/19/17. SAME NEW NOTE - 2. As of 07/15/19, Robert Brumfield has not filed an accounting and response. 07/25/19 CALENDAR #01; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 05/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - (Christine Gail Leong's Petition) SAME NOTE - 1. Notice of Hearing filed 12/03/18 indicates service is short. Need at least 15 days notice. Need new proof of mailing with required language per PC 12201(B) to Neal E Bartlett per Request for Special Notice filed 05/19/17. NEW NOTE - 2. As of 05/06/19, Robert Brumfield has not filed an accounting and response. 05/17/19 CALENDAR #01; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

Petition

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 02/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for (1) removal of executor (2) for suspension of executor's powers (3) requiring Christine Leong as executor to account (Amye Leong's Petition) NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing. 02/07/19 CALENDAR #02

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 12/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. Notice of Hearing filed 12/03/18 indicates service is short. Need at least 15 days notice. Need new proof of mailing with required language per PC 12201(B) to Neal E Bartlett per Request for Special Notice filed 05/19/17.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of Status...returned via file & serve

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: status report (PC 12200) or petition to close the estate SAME NOTE - 1. As of 02/22/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: status report (PC 12200) SAME NOTE - 1. As of 11/15/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 07/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 6/12/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

MO COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 12/5/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

MO Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 7/26/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Need date of death of deceased husband. 2. Need copy of Trust either filed or lodged. 3. Need to copy of Trust.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: first and final account and report of executor, petition for its settlement, for statutory commissions and reimbursement, for statutory attorney's fees and costs, and for distribution and discharge and supplements thereto (Christine Gail Leong petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: first and final account and report of executor, petition for its settlement, for statutory commissions and reimbursement, for statutory attorney's fees and costs, and for distribution and discharge and supplements thereto (Christine Gail Leong petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: case management conference re: first and final account and report of executor, petition for its settlement, for statutory commissions and reimbursement, for statutory attorney's fees and costs, and for distribution and discharge and supplements thereto (Christine Gail Leong petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/10/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Mandatory Settlement Conference. 4/27/20 at 1:30 in D-1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 01/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE: PETITION FOR (1) REMOVAL OF EXECUTOR, (2) FOR SUSPENSION OF EXECUTOR'S POWERS, (3) REQUIRING CHRISTINE LEONG AS EXECUTOR TO ACCOUNT AND DECLARATION THERETO (AMYE LEONG'S PETITION) 01/23/20 CALENDAR #01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Petition 01/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (CHRISTINE GAIL LEONG'S PETITION) 01/23/20 CALENDAR #02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketObjection/Opposition (Probate) - Comment: OBJECTIONS TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection, etc. to Attorney Stephen H. Boyle

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Need date of death of deceased husband. 2. Need copy of Trust either filed or lodged. 3. Need to copy of Trust.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration - Comment: Re Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 6/11/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • Docket874W PMT: Probate New Suit - 1st Petition <$250,000 GC - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for LEONG, CHRISTINE GAIL (PE-1). Received from ERROL G SHAW, check no(s) 10239. Receipt #837217 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: DECLARATION RE CONFIDENTIAL FILING OF EXECUTOR'S DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY 6/11/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H